McDonald, John Christopher (CPSO#: 43069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 743-2040
Fax: (705) 740-6865
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Christopher McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McDonald ( CPSO# 43069 )

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite 201
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6876

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CHRISTOPHER MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1985