McDonald, Lois Marie (CPSO#: 62551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
Emergency Department
265 Dundas Street East
P O Box 428
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: (613) 969-0229
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.M. McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. McDonald ( CPSO# 62551 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOIS MARIE MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1991