McDonald, Marilyn Ruth (CPSO#: 43143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
522 Delaware Avenue
Bethlehem PA  18015
United States
Phone: (610) 861-8977
Fax: (610) 861-9339

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILYN RUTH MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1985