McDonald, Michael William (CPSO#: 62743)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 2005