Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

McDonald, Patrick Joseph (CPSO#: 65218)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003