McDonald, Sandy Ian Rae (CPSO#: 30257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Alliance Boulevard
Barrie ON  L4M 5K3
Phone: (705) 728-8778
Fax: (705) 728-3053
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandy McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McDonald ( CPSO# 30257 )

Business Address:
50 Alliance Boulevard
Barrie ON  L4M 5K3
Phone Number: (705) 728-8778

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDY IAN RAE MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1978