McDonald, Terrence James (CPSO#: 80853)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address:  Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: McArthur Family Medical Centre Unit 206 311 McArthur Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1L 8M3
Date Received: 26 May 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 11 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011