McDougall, Donald Campbell (CPSO#: 25296)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical records may send their request by e-mail to: dcmcdougall@sympatico.ca.
Date Received: 21 Apr 2015


Address: Suite 210 770 Broadview Avenue Ottawa, ON K2A 3Z3
Instructions: Please submit a written request to Dr. Donald McDougall
Date Received: 25 Sep 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 31, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Donald Campbell McDougall to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Department):


I, Dr. Donald Campbell McDougall:

1.Certificate of registration number 25296, am a member of the College. The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.

2. Acknowledge and agree that the College referred allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated November 21, 2012 (the “Notice of Hearing”).

3. Acknowledge and agree that, in exchange for an original copy of this Undertaking as executed by me, the College has agreed to withdraw the Notice of Hearing.

4. Hereby resign from the College effective May 31, 2013 (the “Effective Date”).

5. Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

6. Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I am in breach of this Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration, or equivalent, to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the specified allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing,

12. Give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

13. Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register.