McDougall, Elspeth Marguerita (CPSO#: 42824)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jan 2013