McDowell, Brenda Joan (CPSO#: 29881)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Michael's Hospital, 30 Bond Street, Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 10 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016