McEachren, Todd Mervyn (CPSO#: 73882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Airport Road
St. John's NL  A1A 5A1
Phone: (709) 726-8253
Fax: (709) 747-0889

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD MERVYN MCEACHREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCEACHREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012