McElgunn, Patrick Shane James (CPSO#: 30272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
5815 Blakeney Park Drive
Charlotte NC  28277
United States
Phone: (704) 542-2220
Fax: (704) 542-3304

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK SHANE JAMES MCELGUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCELGUNN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1982