McElhaney, Janet Elizabeth (CPSO#: 61485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Office 32032
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7300 Ext. 2725
Fax: (705) 523-7325
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet E. McElhaney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McElhaney ( CPSO# 61485 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
NECC 32036
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH MCELHANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCELHANEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 3 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2012