McFadden, Robin Garfield (CPSO#: 53084)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin McFadden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: St. Joseph's Health Care 268 Grosvenor Street London ON N6A 4V2
Date Received: 16 Aug 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2016