McFadyen, Craig Alexander (CPSO#: 51436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 647 5301371
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. A. McFadyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McFadyen ( CPSO# 51436 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 1, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On November 25, 2011, Grand River Hospital and St. Mary's General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Craig A. McFadyen's privileges were restricted, effective November 1, 2011. The restrictions were removed on September 4, 2012.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG ALEXANDER MCFADYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFADYEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1985