McFarlane, Brian Arthur Everett (CPSO#: 51851)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 12 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Oct 1988