McFarlane, Lisa Anne (CPSO#: 68777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: Squires, Lisa Anne (used until: 18 Sep 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 16
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone: (519) 745-7482
Fax: (519) 745-1881
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ANNE MCFARLANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFARLANE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997