McFarlane, Philip Alan (CPSO#: 67002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
61 Queen Street East
9th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3702
Fax: (416) 867-3709
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP ALAN MCFARLANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFARLANE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1997