McFarlane, Robert Bruce (CPSO#: 24060)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2016