McFarlane, Virginia Joyce (CPSO#: 59390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2243 Queen Street East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4E 1G1
Phone: (416) 686-2138
Fax: (416) 850-3749
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIRGINIA JOYCE MCFARLANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFARLANE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1989