McFarthing, Anthony Martin (CPSO#: 29416)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Durham, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2008