McFaul, Susan Mary (CPSO#: 57373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 722-5793
Fax: (613) 728-4480
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan McFaul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McFaul ( CPSO# 57373 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
Suite 201
1919 Riverside Dirve
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 722-5793

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY MCFAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFAUL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986