McGann, Craig Trotman (CPSO#: 107067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Internal Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG TROTMAN MCGANN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MCGANN is enrolled at NORTHERN ONTARIO SCHOOL OF MEDICINE;

(2) Dr. MCGANN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MCGANN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MCGANN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MCGANN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MCGANN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018