McGann, Paul Eugene (CPSO#: 51097)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Dec 1996