McGee, Jacob David (CPSO#: 79302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Norwegian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55645
Fax: (519) 685-8176
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacob McGee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McGee ( CPSO# 79302 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACOB DAVID MCGEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008