McGee, Neil J (CPSO#: 55420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4710
Fax: (613) 721-4703
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil McGee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. McGee ( CPSO# 55420 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL J MCGEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1987