McGee, Robert John (CPSO#: 22290)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2002