McGeer, Allison Joan (CPSO#: 51099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Infection Control
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 210
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-3118
Fax: (416) 586-8358
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON JOAN MCGEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGEER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1989