McGillen, Joseph Emerson Michael (CPSO#: 54115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Cardiac Institute
Unit 302
256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: (519) 645-1584
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph E. McGillen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McGillen ( CPSO# 54115 )

Business Address:
London Cardiac Institute
Unit 302
256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone Number: (519) 645-0146

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH EMERSON MICHAEL MCGILLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGILLEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985