McGilvray, Ian Douglas (CPSO#: 66448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
General Surgery Division
11PMB181
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5230
Fax: (416) 340-5242
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN DOUGLAS MCGILVRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGILVRAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2001