McGinn, Mary Joanne (CPSO#: 66775)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2003