McGoey, Brian Vincent (CPSO#: 51101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102B
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 820-3416
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian McGoey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. McGoey ( CPSO# 51101 )

Business Address:
102B - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 820-3416

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN VINCENT MCGOEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGOEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1983