McGoveran, Bruce Maxwell (CPSO#: 71575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Occupational Health Clinic
4th Floor - Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 358-2905
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bruce M. McGoveran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. McGoveran ( CPSO# 71575 )

Business Address:
Occupational Health Clinic
30 Bond Street
4th Floor - Shuter Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 358-2905

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE MAXWELL MCGOVERAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGOVERAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002