McGowan, Hugh Douglas (CPSO#: 30262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1978

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18-740, Ocular Oncology Service
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 4802
Fax: (416) 946-2189
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
Ocular Oncology Service 18-740
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 5430
Fax: (416) 946-2189
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 08 May 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH DOUGLAS MCGOWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGOWAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1978

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Apr 2004
Summary:

 On April 16, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. McGowan committed acts or omissions 
 relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by representing 
 in his applications to the North York General Hospital that he was a member of the Canadian 
 Medical Protective Association, when he was not in fact a member and falsifying a document 
 indicating that he was a such a member. 

The Committee ordered a reprimand, the fact of the 
 reprimand to be recorded on the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 16, 2004