McGowan, Kelly Elizabeth (CPSO#: 95953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Ext. 5331
Fax: (905) 813-3874
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly E. McGowan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McGowan ( CPSO# 95953 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY ELIZABETH MCGOWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGOWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2016