McGrail, John Simon (CPSO#: 17561)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Apr 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012