McGrath, Colm Raymond (CPSO#: 66446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PSFDH
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 283-2320
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colm McGrath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McGrath ( CPSO# 66446 )

Business Address:
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLM RAYMOND MCGRATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGRATH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014