McGregor, Aaron Jay (CPSO#: 103808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B Suite C01
310 Bridge St. W.
Napanee ON  K7R0A4
Phone: (613) 354-7640
Fax: (613) 354-7435
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON JAY MCGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016