McGregor, Alexander Pearson (CPSO#: 32604)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Health Centre 30 The Queensway Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Date Received: 12 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017