McGregor, James Edward Allaster (CPSO#: 31307)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1978 to 14 Jun 1979
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013