McGregor, Penelope Kathryn (CPSO#: 74937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 70
28 St John Street
Merrickville ON  K0G 1N0
Phone: (613) 269-2970
Fax: (613) 269-4194
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PENELOPE KATHRYN MCGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 16 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2002