McGregor, Thomas Brian (CPSO#: 80894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Urology
Victory 4, Room 3-4-222
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2437
Fax: (613) 545-1970
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Brian McGregor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. McGregor ( CPSO# 80894 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Urology
Empire 4 Room 3-428
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS BRIAN MCGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009