McGuire, Anna Louise (CPSO#: 84757)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 7115, 2775 Laural Street, VGH, DHCC, Vancouver, BC V5Z 1M9
Date Received: 29 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2015