McGuire, Glenn Patrick (CPSO#: 52720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Western Division
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville street
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5118
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN PATRICK MCGUIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUIRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1988