McGuire, John Joseph (CPSO#: 20494)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003