McGuire, Richard Philip (CPSO#: 55652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Coast General Hospital,
3949 Port Alberni Highway
Port Alberni
Port Alberni BC  V9Y 4S1
Phone: 2507311370
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Philip McGuire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McGuire ( CPSO# 55652 )

Business Address:
241 8th Street
Cochrane ON  P0L 1C0
Phone Number: (705) 272-4958

Business Address:
3949 Port Alberni Highway
Port Alberni BC  V9Y 4S1
Phone Number: (250) 731-1370

Business Address:
489 Alberni Highway
parksville BC  V9Y 1S9
Phone Number: (250) 951-9550

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
Emergency Department
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
P O Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 525-1300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD PHILIP MCGUIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUIRE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1986