McGuire, Shaun Neville (CPSO#: 58387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Family Health Team
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8219
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUN NEVILLE MCGUIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUIRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1988