McGurk, Francis Myrle (CPSO#: 31042)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Nov 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jul 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2005