McHardy, Paul Gregor (CPSO#: 77812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, German

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue Suite M3200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864 Ext. 2729
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul McHardy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. McHardy ( CPSO# 77812 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue Suite M3-200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL GREGOR MCHARDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCHARDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2007