McHattie, James David (CPSO#: 21405)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2015